Do the following tasks in your Math notebook:
Task 1: Solve the following:
a) 5 – 3
b) 8 – 6
c) 9 – 2
Task 2: Solve the word problems:
a) In a school, 409 chairs and 528 tables were made by the carpenter. How many total furniture items did the carpenter make?
b) I bought 395 kites and 189 cricket kits for donating in an orphanage. How many total items did I buy?
Grade 1 Team
1-Complete the worksheet given to you.
2-Learn the scripts and also think of a name for Annual performance.
Have A Great Day:-)
Grade8 – All
Homework assigned by: firstname.lastname@example.org Submission Date: Wed Feb 06 2019 00:00:00 GMT+0530 (IST) Internet Required: Yes Details: Kindly find the details of H.W. in Grade 8 – Math – All – Google Classroom. Central Presentation Link: Click here to view Expected Time: 35 minutes
Language: Write summary of chapter 16 and 17 based on the discussion in class today.
Students consolidated their understanding of the case study on petroleum and wrote their reflection through a graphic organizer.
Complete the given worksheet.
Find the product of the following:
a) 365 x 83
b) 87 x 95
c) 469 x 74
d) 509 x 66
e) 680 x 49
f) 333 x 96
Describe a character of your choice and include evidences too that would support the character. Keep the following criteria in mind
Choose a strong character
Fears and aspirations
Math: Solve the following in your Math notebook:
Find the percentage of quantity: 1. 8% of Rs 26 2. 80% of Rs 250 3. 20% of 20 litre
Today’s homework is – Tricky words worksheet
Sr KG Team
Annual performance practice
Task 1: Learn the lyrics of Wavin’ Flag ( https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=JSQ7VGjzxLw )
Task 2: Write down you anchor scripts on google doc. and share it with me for approval
Task 3: Learn your scripts by heart.
Read the following story and answer the MCQ
You can email me the answers as a evidence of task completion/print the worksheet.
citation : http://englishforeveryone.org/PDFs/New_Shoes_for_Maddy.pdf
Stars of the day:
Quote of the day: https://www.goodhousekeeping.com/health/wellness/g2401/inspirational-quotes/
Students solved multiplication sums (2 x 2) and (3 x 2) using traditional method.
Find the product of the following using traditional method:
a) 435 x 56 b) 645 x 82 c) 583 x 94
d) 756 x 68 e) 389 x 79
Solve the given worksheet as discussed in the class.
Watch the mentioned link:
Keep Reading and Revising